THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 11:24:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 121 Balmoral Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4V 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 925-8330
Fax: (416) 925-2752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Chisamore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Offman (CPSO#: 65524 ) Dr. B. Chisamore (CPSO#: 65361 )
Business Address: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
NICU, 1st Floor, OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6067

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 121 Balmoral Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4V 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 925-8330
Fax: (416) 925-2752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Chisamore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Offman (CPSO#: 65524 ) Dr. B. Chisamore (CPSO#: 65361 )
Business Address: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
NICU, 1st Floor, OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6067

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HILARY JOY OFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OFFMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HILARY JOY OFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992