THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:34:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Addiction
MCCR building 5th floor 1025 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 36859
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rita and Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Selby (CPSO#: 66705 ) Dr. P. Selby (CPSO#: 65523 )

Corporation Name: Rita & Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Addiction
MCCR building 5th floor 1025 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 36859
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rita and Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Selby (CPSO#: 66705 ) Dr. P. Selby (CPSO#: 65523 )

Corporation Name: Rita & Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER LESLIE SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER LESLIE SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992