THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:32:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Hematology / Laboratory Medicine
Room D 675a
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164805561
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto general hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G2C4
Phone: 416 340 4800
Extension: 2563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rita and Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Selby (CPSO#: 66705 ) Dr. P. Selby (CPSO#: 65523 )

Corporation Name: Rita & Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Hematology / Laboratory Medicine
Room D 675a
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164805561
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto general hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G2C4
Phone: 416 340 4800
Extension: 2563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 12 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rita and Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Selby (CPSO#: 66705 ) Dr. P. Selby (CPSO#: 65523 )

Corporation Name: Rita & Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RITA SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RITA SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nagpur University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993