THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 10:11:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rusen Steele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rusen (CPSO#: 65529 ) Dr. L. Steele (CPSO#: 67811 )
Business Address: 112 Avon Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5N7
(519) 273-1576
Business Address: PO Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
(519) 348-8402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rusen Steele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rusen (CPSO#: 65529 ) Dr. L. Steele (CPSO#: 67811 )
Business Address: 112 Avon Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5N7
(519) 273-1576
Business Address: PO Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
(519) 348-8402

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992