THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7 Francis Street
P O Box 790
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Address: 4118A Rd 164, RR5
West Perth Village
Mitchell ON N0K 1N0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rusen Steele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rusen (CPSO#: 65529 ) Dr. L. Steele (CPSO#: 67811 )
Business Address: 112 Avon Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5N7
(519) 273-1576
Business Address: PO Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
(519) 348-8402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7 Francis Street
P O Box 790
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 348-8402
Fax: (519) 348-8400
Address: 4118A Rd 164, RR5
West Perth Village
Mitchell ON N0K 1N0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rusen Steele Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rusen (CPSO#: 65529 ) Dr. L. Steele (CPSO#: 67811 )
Business Address: 112 Avon Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5N7
(519) 273-1576
Business Address: PO Box 790
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N0K 1N0
(519) 348-8402

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIORA REBECCA STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIORA REBECCA STEELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEELE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994