THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 350
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 966-3301
Fax: (613) 966-3396
Address: 35 Bridge Street
Prince Edward Ontario K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-0400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.H. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
350 - 265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 966-3301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 350
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 966-3301
Fax: (613) 966-3396
Address: 35 Bridge Street
Prince Edward Ontario K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-0400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.H. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
350 - 265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 966-3301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERNEST YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERNEST YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1992