THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:39:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 2417
Fax: (613) 969-1307

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.H. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
350 - 265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 966-3301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 2417
Fax: (613) 969-1307

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.H. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen (CPSO#: 71881 ) Dr. E. Yee (CPSO#: 65734 )
Business Address: Belleville General Hospital
350 - 265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 966-3301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THIEN HUONG NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THIEN HUONG NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1997