THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 08:16:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Brampton Civic Hospital, 2100 Bovaird Drive East, Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. CARVALHO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carvalho (CPSO#: 66298 ) Dr. M. Carvalho (CPSO#: 101208 )

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Brampton Civic Hospital, 2100 Bovaird Drive East, Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. CARVALHO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carvalho (CPSO#: 66298 ) Dr. M. Carvalho (CPSO#: 101208 )

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 1993