THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 07:18:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 453 0715
Fax: 905 453 0972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JS Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sachdeva (CPSO#: 66594 ) Dr. A. Filomeno De Figueiredo (CPSO#: 68006 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 157 Queen St E
Suite 102
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
(905) 453-0715

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 453 0715
Fax: 905 453 0972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JS Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sachdeva (CPSO#: 66594 ) Dr. A. Filomeno De Figueiredo (CPSO#: 68006 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 157 Queen St E
Suite 102
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
(905) 453-0715

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASDIP SINGH SACHDEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHDEVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASDIP SINGH SACHDEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHDEVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993