THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:35:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KONKANI, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-2333 Dundas St W
Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 534-4455
Fax: (416) 534-2437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JS Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sachdeva (CPSO#: 66594 ) Dr. A. Filomeno De Figueiredo (CPSO#: 68006 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 157 Queen St E
Suite 102
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
(905) 453-0715

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KONKANI, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-2333 Dundas St W
Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 534-4455
Fax: (416) 534-2437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JS Sachdeva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sachdeva (CPSO#: 66594 ) Dr. A. Filomeno De Figueiredo (CPSO#: 68006 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 157 Queen St E
Suite 102
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
(905) 453-0715

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIA FILOMENO DE FIGUEIREDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILOMENO DE FIGUEIREDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTONIA FILOMENO DE FIGUEIREDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILOMENO DE FIGUEIREDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994