THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 08:26:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Room 6-045 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011
123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 23 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elepano and Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elepano (CPSO#: 71554 ) Dr. R. Leung (CPSO#: 66780 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
6-045
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-6026
Business Address: 4-1901 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
416-483-0102
Business Address: 303-1835 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1X8
416-792-9436
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
Room 6-045 Bond Wing
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011
123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 23 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elepano and Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elepano (CPSO#: 71554 ) Dr. R. Leung (CPSO#: 66780 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
6-045
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-6026
Business Address: 4-1901 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
416-483-0102
Business Address: 303-1835 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1X8
416-792-9436
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD SEI TZA LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD SEI TZA LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993