THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:18:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sleep Care Solutions
1835 Yonge Street, Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 792-9436
Fax: (416) 792-9438
Address: 4-1901 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
Phone: 416-483-0102
Fax: 416-483-9393
Address: 1901 Yonge St
Unit 4
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
Phone: 416 483-0102
Fax: 416 483-9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may submit a medical record request via email to [email protected].
Date Received: 11 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elepano and Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elepano (CPSO#: 71554 ) Dr. R. Leung (CPSO#: 66780 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
6-045
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-6026
Business Address: 4-1901 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
416-483-0102
Business Address: 303-1835 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1X8
416-792-9436
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sleep Care Solutions
1835 Yonge Street, Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 792-9436
Fax: (416) 792-9438
Address: 4-1901 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
Phone: 416-483-0102
Fax: 416-483-9393
Address: 1901 Yonge St
Unit 4
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
Phone: 416 483-0102
Fax: 416 483-9393

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may submit a medical record request via email to [email protected].
Date Received: 11 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elepano and Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elepano (CPSO#: 71554 ) Dr. R. Leung (CPSO#: 66780 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
6-045
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
416-864-6026
Business Address: 4-1901 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
416-483-0102
Business Address: 303-1835 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 1X8
416-792-9436
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
416-813-2277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE M ELEPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELEPANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE M ELEPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELEPANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997