THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:51:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 163 Mary St
Unit 1
Orillia ON L3V 3E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053256805
Fax: 7053259402
Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Seki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seki (CPSO#: 66811 ) Dr. N. Rowhani-Seki (CPSO#: 66874 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: Unit 3
4337 Burnside Line
Orillia Ontario L3V 0W1
(705) 325-6805

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 163 Mary St
Unit 1
Orillia ON L3V 3E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053256805
Fax: 7053259402
Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Seki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seki (CPSO#: 66811 ) Dr. N. Rowhani-Seki (CPSO#: 66874 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: Unit 3
4337 Burnside Line
Orillia Ontario L3V 0W1
(705) 325-6805

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN TOSHIHIKO SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN TOSHIHIKO SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Aug 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993