THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:34:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: Seki, Neda (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Seki, Neda (Used Until: 13 Feb 2001)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: (705) 325-9402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Seki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seki (CPSO#: 66811 ) Dr. N. Rowhani-Seki (CPSO#: 66874 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: Unit 3
4337 Burnside Line
Orillia Ontario L3V 0W1
(705) 325-6805

General Information

Former Name: Seki, Neda (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Seki, Neda (Used Until: 13 Feb 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: (705) 325-9402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Seki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seki (CPSO#: 66811 ) Dr. N. Rowhani-Seki (CPSO#: 66874 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: Unit 3
4337 Burnside Line
Orillia Ontario L3V 0W1
(705) 325-6805

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEDA ROWHANI-SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWHANI-SEKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEDA ROWHANI-SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWHANI-SEKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993