THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 11:05:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8074689861
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diamond Pedersen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedersen (CPSO#: 68549 ) Dr. R. Diamond (CPSO#: 66884 )
Business Address: 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-3021
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8074689861
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diamond Pedersen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedersen (CPSO#: 68549 ) Dr. R. Diamond (CPSO#: 66884 )
Business Address: 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-3021
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHONDA RUTH DIAMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAMOND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHONDA RUTH DIAMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAMOND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993