THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:43:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diamond Pedersen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedersen (CPSO#: 68549 ) Dr. R. Diamond (CPSO#: 66884 )
Business Address: 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-3021
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diamond Pedersen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedersen (CPSO#: 68549 ) Dr. R. Diamond (CPSO#: 66884 )
Business Address: 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-3021
Business Address: 21 Sylvan Street
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVEN ALEXANDER PEDERSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDERSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVEN ALEXANDER PEDERSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDERSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1994
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 1994