THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:17:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Room 8-8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7309
Fax: (416) 323-6173
Address: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Urbach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Urbach (CPSO#: 66967 ) Dr. S. Urbach (CPSO#: 69254 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Room 8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7712

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Room 8-8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7309
Fax: (416) 323-6173
Address: University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Urbach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Urbach (CPSO#: 66967 ) Dr. S. Urbach (CPSO#: 69254 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Room 8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT URBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT URBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993