THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:29:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: Varkul, Stacey Lisa (Used Until: 15 Apr 1997)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3077 Bathurst St
Suite 102
Toronto ON M6A 1Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-789-4376
Fax: 416-785-2177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Urbach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Urbach (CPSO#: 66967 ) Dr. S. Urbach (CPSO#: 69254 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Room 8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7712

General Information

Former Name: Varkul, Stacey Lisa (Used Until: 15 Apr 1997)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3077 Bathurst St
Suite 102
Toronto ON M6A 1Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-789-4376
Fax: 416-785-2177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Robert Urbach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Urbach (CPSO#: 66967 ) Dr. S. Urbach (CPSO#: 69254 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
Room 8332
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACEY LISA URBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACEY LISA URBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995