THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 09:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division Cardiac Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3153
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: duggal medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Raymond (CPSO#: 67043 ) Dr. N. Duggal (CPSO#: 65435 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
519 663 2926

Corporation Name: Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Division Cardiac Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3153
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: duggal medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Raymond (CPSO#: 67043 ) Dr. N. Duggal (CPSO#: 65435 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
519 663 2926

Corporation Name: Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Jan 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 21 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Louise Raymond may practise medicine as a surgical assistant, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Louise Raymond may practise medicine as a surgical assistant, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2019
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993