THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:20:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-3230
Fax: (613) 533-3244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joneja & Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joneja (CPSO#: 67896 ) Dr. S. Gill (CPSO#: 71319 )
Business Address: 2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-3230
Business Address: Providence Care Hospital
D1.539J
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-3230
Fax: (613) 533-3244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joneja & Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joneja (CPSO#: 67896 ) Dr. S. Gill (CPSO#: 71319 )
Business Address: 2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-3230
Business Address: Providence Care Hospital
D1.539J
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALA JONEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONEJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALA JONEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONEJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994