THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 08:31:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Extension: 53278
Fax: (613) 544-4017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joneja & Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joneja (CPSO#: 67896 ) Dr. S. Gill (CPSO#: 71319 )
Business Address: 2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-3230
Business Address: Providence Care Hospital
D1.539J
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Extension: 53278
Fax: (613) 544-4017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 13 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joneja & Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joneja (CPSO#: 67896 ) Dr. S. Gill (CPSO#: 71319 )
Business Address: 2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
94 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-3230
Business Address: Providence Care Hospital
D1.539J
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDEEP SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDEEP SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997