THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:39:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Juan N. Corpas, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Jan 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaparro Mutis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gutierrez (CPSO#: 73272 ) Dr. B. Chaparro Mutis (CPSO#: 68585 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6 - 040
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 5409
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6507
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Respirology
585 University Avenue
PMB 11 - 132
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4996

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Juan N. Corpas, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Jan 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaparro Mutis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gutierrez (CPSO#: 73272 ) Dr. B. Chaparro Mutis (CPSO#: 68585 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6 - 040
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 5409
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6507
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Respirology
585 University Avenue
PMB 11 - 132
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4996

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Jun 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 20 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Blanca Cecilia Chaparro Mutis may practise medicine independently in
respirology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Blanca Cecilia Chaparro Mutis may practise medicine independently in
respirology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Juan N. Corpas, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1994