THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 09:11:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaparro Mutis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gutierrez (CPSO#: 73272 ) Dr. B. Chaparro Mutis (CPSO#: 68585 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6 - 040
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 5409
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6507
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Respirology
585 University Avenue
PMB 11 - 132
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4996

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaparro Mutis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gutierrez (CPSO#: 73272 ) Dr. B. Chaparro Mutis (CPSO#: 68585 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6 - 040
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-6060 Extn: 5409
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6507
Business Address: UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Respirology
585 University Avenue
PMB 11 - 132
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4996

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1999
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 1999