THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 06:17:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056 Station C
3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Koke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Koke (CPSO#: 68906 ) Dr. S. Brickell (CPSO#: 68888 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital - Freeport
3570 King Street East
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 7366

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056 Station C
3570 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Koke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Koke (CPSO#: 68906 ) Dr. S. Brickell (CPSO#: 68888 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital - Freeport
3570 King Street East
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 7366

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ELIZABETH BRICKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRICKELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ELIZABETH BRICKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRICKELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995