THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital - Freeport
P O Box 9056
3570 King St E
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Extension: 8313
Fax: (519) 894-8323
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Oncology Program - Medical Day Care
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4940
Fax: (519) 740-7722

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Koke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Koke (CPSO#: 68906 ) Dr. S. Brickell (CPSO#: 68888 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital - Freeport
3570 King Street East
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 7366

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital - Freeport
P O Box 9056
3570 King St E
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Extension: 8313
Fax: (519) 894-8323
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Oncology Program - Medical Day Care
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 740-4940
Fax: (519) 740-7722

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Koke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Koke (CPSO#: 68906 ) Dr. S. Brickell (CPSO#: 68888 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital - Freeport
3570 King Street East
PO Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 7366

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN KOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN KOKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995