THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology-Room C6-128
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3485
Fax: (519) 663-3484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shoemaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ponti-Sgargi (CPSO#: 68947 ) Dr. G. Shoemaker (CPSO#: 68938 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-128
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3485
Business Address: 600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774 Extn: 2385

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology-Room C6-128
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3485
Fax: (519) 663-3484

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shoemaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ponti-Sgargi (CPSO#: 68947 ) Dr. G. Shoemaker (CPSO#: 68938 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-128
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3485
Business Address: 600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774 Extn: 2385

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GERARD JOSEPH SHOEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOEMAKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GERARD JOSEPH SHOEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOEMAKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995