THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 06:49:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Sanatorium Rd.
London Ontario N6H 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 858-2774
Extension: 2085
Fax: (519) 858-9789

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shoemaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ponti-Sgargi (CPSO#: 68947 ) Dr. G. Shoemaker (CPSO#: 68938 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-128
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3485
Business Address: 600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774 Extn: 2385

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Sanatorium Rd.
London Ontario N6H 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 858-2774
Extension: 2085
Fax: (519) 858-9789

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shoemaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ponti-Sgargi (CPSO#: 68947 ) Dr. G. Shoemaker (CPSO#: 68938 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-128
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3485
Business Address: 600 Sanatorium Road
London Ontario N6H 3W7
(519) 858-2774 Extn: 2385

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE GRACE PONTI-SGARGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONTI-SGARGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE GRACE PONTI-SGARGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONTI-SGARGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995