THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:00:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75637
Fax: (905) 521-2655

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Engmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Engmann (CPSO#: 69279 ) Dr. M. Zachos (CPSO#: 69244 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4601
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 1198 Colborne Court
Oakville Ontario L6J 6B9
(905) 844-5556
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
Department of Radiology
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L6T 2X5
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75637
Fax: (905) 521-2655

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Engmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Engmann (CPSO#: 69279 ) Dr. M. Zachos (CPSO#: 69244 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4601
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 1198 Colborne Court
Oakville Ontario L6J 6B9
(905) 844-5556
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
Department of Radiology
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L6T 2X5
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANTHI ZACHOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZACHOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANTHI ZACHOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZACHOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995