THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 11:44:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Radiology
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: 905-873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Radiology
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L9T 2X5
Phone: (905) 876-7023
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Engmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Engmann (CPSO#: 69279 ) Dr. M. Zachos (CPSO#: 69244 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4601
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 1198 Colborne Court
Oakville Ontario L6J 6B9
(905) 844-5556
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
Department of Radiology
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L6T 2X5
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Radiology
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: 905-873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Department of Radiology
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L9T 2X5
Phone: (905) 876-7023
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Engmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Engmann (CPSO#: 69279 ) Dr. M. Zachos (CPSO#: 69244 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 338-4601
Business Address: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 1198 Colborne Court
Oakville Ontario L6J 6B9
(905) 844-5556
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
Department of Radiology
30 Derry Road East
Milton Ontario L6T 2X5
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC CARL ENGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC CARL ENGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995