THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:58:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 746-1011
Fax: (416) 746-1411
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 28 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varkul and Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Varkul (CPSO#: 69255 ) Dr. J. Shapiro (CPSO#: 70403 )
Business Address: 100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 746-1011
Business Address: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
(416) 743-5853

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 746-1011
Fax: (416) 746-1411
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 28 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varkul and Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Varkul (CPSO#: 69255 ) Dr. J. Shapiro (CPSO#: 70403 )
Business Address: 100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 746-1011
Business Address: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
(416) 743-5853

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID VARKUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARKUL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID VARKUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARKUL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995