THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 10:01:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: 416-743-1358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varkul and Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Varkul (CPSO#: 69255 ) Dr. J. Shapiro (CPSO#: 70403 )
Business Address: 100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 746-1011
Business Address: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
(416) 743-5853

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: 416-743-1358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varkul and Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Varkul (CPSO#: 69255 ) Dr. J. Shapiro (CPSO#: 70403 )
Business Address: 100 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G4
(416) 746-1011
Business Address: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
(416) 743-5853

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA LOUISE SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNA LOUISE SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996