THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 09:21:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 754-2727
Fax: 855-387-7624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tjon and Tsin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tjon (CPSO#: 69260 ) Dr. K. Tsin (CPSO#: 69257 )
Business Address: 201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
(905) 604-3336
Business Address: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 754-2727

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 754-2727
Fax: 855-387-7624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tjon and Tsin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tjon (CPSO#: 69260 ) Dr. K. Tsin (CPSO#: 69257 )
Business Address: 201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
(905) 604-3336
Business Address: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 754-2727

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN WEICHUAN TSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN WEICHUAN TSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995