THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-3601 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-604-3336
Fax: 905-604-7750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tjon and Tsin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tjon (CPSO#: 69260 ) Dr. K. Tsin (CPSO#: 69257 )
Business Address: 201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
(905) 604-3336
Business Address: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 754-2727

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-3601 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-604-3336
Fax: 905-604-7750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tjon and Tsin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tjon (CPSO#: 69260 ) Dr. K. Tsin (CPSO#: 69257 )
Business Address: 201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
(905) 604-3336
Business Address: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 207
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 754-2727

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER EDWIN TJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER EDWIN TJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995