THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 20:35:15 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay St
Suite 108
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson (CPSO#: 70399 ) Dr. M. Richardson (CPSO#: 69321 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 57658
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 790 Bay St
Suite 108
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson (CPSO#: 70399 ) Dr. M. Richardson (CPSO#: 69321 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 57658
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995