THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:24:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health System Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 57658
Fax: 905-494-6506
Address: 224-40 Finchgate Blvd
Brampton ON L6T 3J1
Phone: 905-451-6959
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
William Osler Health System Etobicoke General Hospital
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 57658
Fax: 905-494-6506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson (CPSO#: 70399 ) Dr. M. Richardson (CPSO#: 69321 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 57658
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health System Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 57658
Fax: 905-494-6506
Address: 224-40 Finchgate Blvd
Brampton ON L6T 3J1
Phone: 905-451-6959
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
William Osler Health System Etobicoke General Hospital
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Extension: 57658
Fax: 905-494-6506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Microbiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Microbiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson (CPSO#: 70399 ) Dr. M. Richardson (CPSO#: 69321 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 57658
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CAMPBELL RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CAMPBELL RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996