THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 09:26:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 46611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Grant and Dr. C. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant (CPSO#: 69401 ) Dr. C. Kargel (CPSO#: 71116 )
Business Address: 370 Bayview Dr
Suite 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 49 High Street, Suite 206
Barrie ON L4N 5J4
7057300286

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 46611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Grant and Dr. C. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant (CPSO#: 69401 ) Dr. C. Kargel (CPSO#: 71116 )
Business Address: 370 Bayview Dr
Suite 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 49 High Street, Suite 206
Barrie ON L4N 5J4
7057300286

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW NEAL GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW NEAL GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995