THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:34:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118-370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057288860
Fax: 7057374733
Address: Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
102-480 Huronia Rd.
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Phone: 7057920933
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Towards Recovery Clinics
49 High Street, Suite 206
Barrie ON L4N 5J4
Phone: 7057300286
Fax: 7057300287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Grant and Dr. C. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant (CPSO#: 69401 ) Dr. C. Kargel (CPSO#: 71116 )
Business Address: 370 Bayview Dr
Suite 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 49 High Street, Suite 206
Barrie ON L4N 5J4
7057300286

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118-370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057288860
Fax: 7057374733
Address: Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
102-480 Huronia Rd.
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Phone: 7057920933
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Towards Recovery Clinics
49 High Street, Suite 206
Barrie ON L4N 5J4
Phone: 7057300286
Fax: 7057300287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Grant and Dr. C. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant (CPSO#: 69401 ) Dr. C. Kargel (CPSO#: 71116 )
Business Address: 370 Bayview Dr
Suite 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 49 High Street, Suite 206
Barrie ON L4N 5J4
7057300286

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE SIMONE KARGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARGEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE SIMONE KARGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARGEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997