THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Iran, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-5638
Fax: (905) 884-8068
Address: Suite 410
250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill, ON
L4C 9M7
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068
Address: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grouhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grouhi (CPSO#: 80543 ) Dr. M. Grouhi (CPSO#: 69470 )
Business Address: York Allergy, Asthma & Immunology Centre
410-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
9058845638
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2310
Business Address: 9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T9
(905) 884-5638

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Iran, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-5638
Fax: (905) 884-8068
Address: Suite 410
250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill, ON
L4C 9M7
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068
Address: Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grouhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grouhi (CPSO#: 80543 ) Dr. M. Grouhi (CPSO#: 69470 )
Business Address: York Allergy, Asthma & Immunology Centre
410-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
9058845638
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2310
Business Address: 9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T9
(905) 884-5638

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASOUD GROUHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROUHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASOUD GROUHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROUHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Iran, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1995