THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 410-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068
Address: 9981 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1T9
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068
Address: Suite 410
250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill, ON
L4C 9M7
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grouhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grouhi (CPSO#: 80543 ) Dr. M. Grouhi (CPSO#: 69470 )
Business Address: York Allergy, Asthma & Immunology Centre
410-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
9058845638
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2310
Business Address: 9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T9
(905) 884-5638

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 410-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068
Address: 9981 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 1T9
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068
Address: Suite 410
250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill, ON
L4C 9M7
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-884-5638
Fax: 905-884-8068

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grouhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grouhi (CPSO#: 80543 ) Dr. M. Grouhi (CPSO#: 69470 )
Business Address: York Allergy, Asthma & Immunology Centre
410-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
9058845638
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2310
Business Address: 9981 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1T9
(905) 884-5638

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHPAR GROUHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROUHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHPAR GROUHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROUHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tabriz University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2004