THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:20:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Hollandview Trail
SUITE 100
Aurora Ontario L4G 7M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058364600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stacy O'Blenes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 76460 ) Dr. S. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 69651 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Hollandview Trail
SUITE 100
Aurora Ontario L4G 7M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058364600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stacy O'Blenes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 76460 ) Dr. S. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 69651 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY BRIAN O'BLENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BLENES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY BRIAN O'BLENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BLENES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jan 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1995