THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Hollandview Trail
Suite 100
Aurora Ontario L4G 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-727-0285
Fax: 905-726-8208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 11 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stacy O'Blenes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 76460 ) Dr. S. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 69651 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Hollandview Trail
Suite 100
Aurora Ontario L4G 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-727-0285
Fax: 905-726-8208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 11 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stacy O'Blenes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 76460 ) Dr. S. O'Blenes (CPSO#: 69651 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE AMY ELIZABETH O'BLENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BLENES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE AMY ELIZABETH O'BLENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BLENES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001