THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:24:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 318B-395 Carrie St.
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-8392
Fax: (519) 245-8305
Address: 1824 concession dr
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elgamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elgamal (CPSO#: 69779 ) Dr. G. Abdel Malek (CPSO#: 86844 )
Business Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 318B
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-8392
Business Address: 200 - 785 Wonderland Road
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(519) 641-6712
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
(519) 693-4441

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 318B-395 Carrie St.
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-8392
Fax: (519) 245-8305
Address: 1824 concession dr
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elgamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elgamal (CPSO#: 69779 ) Dr. G. Abdel Malek (CPSO#: 86844 )
Business Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 318B
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-8392
Business Address: 200 - 785 Wonderland Road
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(519) 641-6712
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
(519) 693-4441

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKRAM SHAWKY ELGAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELGAMAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKRAM SHAWKY ELGAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELGAMAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 1996