THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:32:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West London Family Health Org
Westmount Mall
785 Wonderland Road South 2nd Floor
London Ontario N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elgamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elgamal (CPSO#: 69779 ) Dr. G. Abdel Malek (CPSO#: 86844 )
Business Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 318B
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-8392
Business Address: 200 - 785 Wonderland Road
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(519) 641-6712
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
(519) 693-4441

Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West London Family Health Org
Westmount Mall
785 Wonderland Road South 2nd Floor
London Ontario N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elgamal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elgamal (CPSO#: 69779 ) Dr. G. Abdel Malek (CPSO#: 86844 )
Business Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 318B
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3C9
(519) 245-8392
Business Address: 200 - 785 Wonderland Road
London Ontario N6K 1M6
(519) 641-6712
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
(519) 693-4441

Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAN FOUAD KAMEL ABDEL MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIHAN FOUAD KAMEL ABDEL MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007