THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Westheights Drive
Suite 201
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-5555
Fax: (519) 578-5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milio & Ghally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghally (CPSO#: 69864 ) Dr. H. Milio (CPSO#: 69836 )
Business Address: 201 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
(519) 578-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Westheights Drive
Suite 201
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-5555
Fax: (519) 578-5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milio & Ghally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghally (CPSO#: 69864 ) Dr. H. Milio (CPSO#: 69836 )
Business Address: 201 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
(519) 578-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANY SHAWKY MILIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANY SHAWKY MILIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1996