THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:43:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Westheights Drive
201
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 578 5555
Fax: 519 578 5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milio & Ghally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghally (CPSO#: 69864 ) Dr. H. Milio (CPSO#: 69836 )
Business Address: 201 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
(519) 578-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Westheights Drive
201
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 578 5555
Fax: 519 578 5551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milio & Ghally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghally (CPSO#: 69864 ) Dr. H. Milio (CPSO#: 69836 )
Business Address: 201 - 10 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2A8
(519) 578-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEHAN RAFAAT GHALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEHAN RAFAAT GHALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2019
Summary:
Note: Effective August 28, 2020 Dr. Ghally has completed the elements of his SCERP
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2019
Summary:
Note: Effective August 28, 2020 Dr. Ghally has completed the elements of his SCERP
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 1996