THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 18:43:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theal Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Didyk (CPSO#: 70028 ) Dr. M. Theal (CPSO#: 69924 )

Corporation Name: Michael Theal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theal Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Didyk (CPSO#: 70028 ) Dr. M. Theal (CPSO#: 69924 )

Corporation Name: Michael Theal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DONALD THEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DONALD THEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996