THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212330
Extension: 3390
Fax: 519-740-4948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theal Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Didyk (CPSO#: 70028 ) Dr. M. Theal (CPSO#: 69924 )

Corporation Name: Nicole Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196212330
Extension: 3390
Fax: 519-740-4948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theal Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Didyk (CPSO#: 70028 ) Dr. M. Theal (CPSO#: 69924 )

Corporation Name: Nicole Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ELAINE DIDYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIDYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE ELAINE DIDYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIDYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996