THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:06:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 126 May Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 623-3929
Fax: (807) 622-5633
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6453
Fax: 807 684-6450
Address: Thunder Bay Correctional Centre
2351 Hwy 61
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4Y4
Phone: 807-475-8401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-343-8361
Fax: 807-343-7740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lailey Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stewart (CPSO#: 69939 ) Dr. J. Lailey (CPSO#: 69949 )
Business Address: 2351 Highway 61
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4Y4
(807) 475-8401
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
(807) 343-8361
Business Address: 126 May Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
(807) 623-3929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 126 May Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 623-3929
Fax: (807) 622-5633
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6453
Fax: 807 684-6450
Address: Thunder Bay Correctional Centre
2351 Hwy 61
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4Y4
Phone: 807-475-8401
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-343-8361
Fax: 807-343-7740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lailey Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stewart (CPSO#: 69939 ) Dr. J. Lailey (CPSO#: 69949 )
Business Address: 2351 Highway 61
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4Y4
(807) 475-8401
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
(807) 343-8361
Business Address: 126 May Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
(807) 623-3929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD JAY STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD JAY STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996