THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:30:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 126 South May Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 623-3929
Extension: 3
Fax: (807) 622-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lailey Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stewart (CPSO#: 69939 ) Dr. J. Lailey (CPSO#: 69949 )
Business Address: 2351 Highway 61
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4Y4
(807) 475-8401
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
(807) 343-8361
Business Address: 126 May Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
(807) 623-3929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 126 South May Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 623-3929
Extension: 3
Fax: (807) 622-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lailey Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stewart (CPSO#: 69939 ) Dr. J. Lailey (CPSO#: 69949 )
Business Address: 2351 Highway 61
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4Y4
(807) 475-8401
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
(807) 343-8361
Business Address: 126 May Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 1B3
(807) 623-3929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN LAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAILEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN LAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAILEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996