THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: De Lange, Sandra Roxanne (Used Until: 03 Dec 1996)
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 5X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 326-2208
Fax: (705) 325-9498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tigchelaar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 71277 ) Dr. S. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 69972 )
Business Address: Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-1825

General Information

Former Name: De Lange, Sandra Roxanne (Used Until: 03 Dec 1996)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia Ontario L3V 5X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 326-2208
Fax: (705) 325-9498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tigchelaar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 71277 ) Dr. S. Tigchelaar (CPSO#: 69972 )
Business Address: Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-1825

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ROXANNE TIGCHELAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIGCHELAAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ROXANNE TIGCHELAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIGCHELAAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996